MI SB0405 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; credit; tax credit for charitable donations to food banks, shelters, and community foundations; restore. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 261.
Title
Individual income tax; credit; tax credit for charitable donations to food banks, shelters, and community foundations; restore. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 261.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 543 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-12-13 | House | Received On 12/13/2017 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 543 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tonya Schuitmaker |