MI SB0279 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; public school employees; computing retirement allowance based on employee organization professional services leave or released time; modify. Amends sec. 71 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1371).
Title
Retirement; public school employees; computing retirement allowance based on employee organization professional services leave or released time; modify. Amends sec. 71 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1371).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Commerce And Trade (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 504 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Commerce And Trade (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 504 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-12-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-01-20 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2016-01-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2015-11-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-11-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-11-10 | House | Received On 11/10/2015 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 504 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Marty Knollenberg |