MI SB0257 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Education Reform
Pending: House Education Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Education Reform
Pending: House Education Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Recreation; athletics and sports; athletes with an intellectual disability empowerment commission; create. Creates new act.
Title
Recreation; athletics and sports; athletes with an intellectual disability empowerment commission; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Sen. Ian Conyers [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 526 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 526 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ian Conyers |