MI SB0212 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0072'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0072'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Probate: other; references to a "married minor" in the estates and protected individuals code; eliminate. Amends secs. 2519, 5103, 5204, 5206 & 5215 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.2519 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0209'23
Title
Probate: other; references to a "married minor" in the estates and protected individuals code; eliminate. Amends secs. 2519, 5103, 5204, 5206 & 5215 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.2519 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0209'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 430 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 250 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 372 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 250 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 372 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0072'23 With Immediate Effect |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/12/2023 10:36 Am |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/11/2023 01:06 Pm |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/06/2023 02:42 Pm |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 430 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-06-28 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2023-06-28 | House | Returned To Senate |
2023-06-28 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2023-06-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 250 Yeas 103 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2023-06-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-06-28 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-06-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-06-28 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2023-06-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-06-28 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2023-06-28 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2023-06-27 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2023-06-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2023-06-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-06-22 | House | Received On 06/22/2023 |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 372 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Veronica Klinefelt |
Same As/Similar To
SB0209 (Same As) 2023-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0071'23 With Immediate Effect