MI SB0207 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - Assigned Pa 0109'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - Assigned Pa 0109'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; hunting; minimum hunting age; eliminate, and create mentored youth hunting program. Amends sec. 43517 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43517). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4371'11
Title
Natural resources; hunting; minimum hunting age; eliminate, and create mentored youth hunting program. Amends sec. 43517 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43517). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4371'11
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hune [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 371 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 361 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 239 (Y: 86 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 106 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 361 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 239 (Y: 86 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 106 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-24 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0109'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/20/2011 @ 1:10 Pm |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/20/2011 @ 9:58 Am |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Presented To Governor 7/6/2011 @ 2:18 Pm |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Roll Call # 371 Yeas 33 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-29 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Enrollment Vacated |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Roll Call # 361 Yeas 31 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2011-06-29 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2011-06-29 | Senate | House Amended Title |
2011-06-28 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-06-28 | House | Title Amended |
2011-06-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 239 Yeas 86 Nays 22 |
2011-06-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-23 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2011-06-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-05-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-05-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-04-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2011-04-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-04-27 | House | Received On 04/27/2011 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 106 Yeas 30 Nays 6 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2011-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2011-03-22 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2011-03-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
Same As/Similar To
HB4371 (Same As) 2011-07-27 - Assigned Pa 120'11 With Immediate Effect