MI HB4371 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Assigned Pa 120'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Assigned Pa 120'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; hunting; minimum hunting age; eliminate, and create mentored youth hunting program. Amends secs. 43520, 43525a & 43531 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43520 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0207'11
Title
Natural resources; hunting; minimum hunting age; eliminate, and create mentored youth hunting program. Amends secs. 43520, 43525a & 43531 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43520 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0207'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 271 (Y: 85 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 146 (Y: 85 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 146 (Y: 85 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-27 | House | Assigned Pa 120'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-07-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/20/2011 @ 3:06 Pm |
2011-07-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/20/2011 @ 2:27 Pm |
2011-07-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 7/6/2011 @ 3:36 Pm |
2011-06-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-06-30 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2011-06-30 | House | Roll Call # 271 Yeas 85 Nays 23 |
2011-06-30 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-06-30 | House | Rule Suspended |
2011-06-30 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-06-30 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2011-05-24 | House | Transmitted |
2011-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 146 Yeas 85 Nays 23 |
2011-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-05-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-05-19 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2011-05-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-03-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-03-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-03-03 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/03/2011 |
2011-03-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2011-03-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-03-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Pettalia |
Same As/Similar To
SB0207 (Same As) 2011-08-24 - Assigned Pa 0109'11 With Immediate Effect