MI SB0146 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax: deductions; tax incentive for contributions made to first-time home buyers program; provide for. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0145'21
Title
Individual income tax: deductions; tax incentive for contributions made to first-time home buyers program; provide for. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0145'21
Sponsors
Sen. James Runestad [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Sen. Paul Wojno [D] | Sen. Michael MacDonald [R] |
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] | Rep. Curtis VanderWall [R] | Sen. Adam Hollier [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 100 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 100 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2021-10-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2021-04-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-22 | House | Received On 04/22/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 100 Yeas 29 Nays 5 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Runestad |