MI SB0119 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation
Pending: House Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation
Pending: House Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: inspectors; eligibility requirements for mining inspectors; modify. Amends title & secs. 1 & 6 of 1911 PA 163 (MCL 425.101 & 425.106) & repeals sec. 2 of 1911 PA 163 (MCL 425.102).
Title
Occupations: inspectors; eligibility requirements for mining inspectors; modify. Amends title & secs. 1 & 6 of 1911 PA 163 (MCL 425.101 & 425.106) & repeals sec. 2 of 1911 PA 163 (MCL 425.102).
Sponsors
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 15 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2021-02-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-24 | House | Received On 02/24/2021 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 15 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom |