MI HCR0028 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Referred To Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Referred To Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to urge the United States Congress to continue to provide funding in the coming years for cleaning up the Great Lakes and protecting them from invasive species.
Title
A concurrent resolution to urge the United States Congress to continue to provide funding in the coming years for cleaning up the Great Lakes and protecting them from invasive species.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Referred To Clerk | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-03-04 | Placed On Messages From The Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-03-04 | Adopted As Substituted S-1 | |
2010-03-04 | Substitute S-1 Adopted | |
2010-01-21 | Placed On Order Of Resolutions | |
2010-01-21 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-01-13 | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-13 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-12-19 | Adopted And Transmitted | |
2009-09-10 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-09-09 | Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment | |
2009-09-09 | Introduced By Representative Rebekah Warren |