MI HB6106 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-13 - Assigned Pa 226'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-13 - Assigned Pa 226'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor: manufacturer; supplier manufacturing private label alcohol; allow under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 105 & 603 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1105 & 436.1603).
Title
Liquor: manufacturer; supplier manufacturing private label alcohol; allow under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 105 & 603 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1105 & 436.1603).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 458 (Y: 97 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 460 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-09-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 338 (Y: 98 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 460 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-09-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 338 (Y: 98 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Assigned Pa 226'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-10-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/14/2022 01:24 Pm |
2022-10-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/14/2022 12:10 Pm |
2022-09-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/05/2022 11:57 Am |
2022-09-28 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-09-28 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-09-28 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 458 Yeas 97 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-09-28 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-09-28 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-09-28 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-09-28 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 460 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-09-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-06-30 | House | Transmitted |
2022-06-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 338 Yeas 98 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-06-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-06-21 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-06-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2022-05-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/18/2022 |
2022-05-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-05-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-05-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Richard Steenland |