MI HB5839 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 410'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 410'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; occupations; permanent revocation; define. Amends sec. 16107 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16107). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5840'14, HB 5841'14, HB 5842'14
Title
Health; occupations; permanent revocation; define. Amends sec. 16107 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16107). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5840'14, HB 5841'14, HB 5842'14
Sponsors
Rep. Klint Kesto [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 808 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 538 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 538 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 410'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 11:41 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2014 @ 9:20 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/23/2014 @ 9:56 Am |
2014-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 808 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2014-10-02 | House | Transmitted |
2014-10-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 538 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2014-10-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-10-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-10-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-09-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-09-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-09-24 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/24/2014 |
2014-09-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2014-09-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Klint Kesto |
Subjects
Health, occupations
Occupations, health care professions
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations, health care professions
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs