MI HB5828 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-11 - Printed Bill Filed 08/16/2012
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-11 - Printed Bill Filed 08/16/2012
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer protection; other; sale or resale of tickets to certain entertainment events and shows; regulate. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5827'12
Title
Consumer protection; other; sale or resale of tickets to certain entertainment events and shows; regulate. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5827'12
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-11 | House | Printed Bill Filed 08/16/2012 |
2012-08-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2012-08-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-08-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Cotter |
Same As/Similar To
SB1187 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-HB-5828 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2012-HIB-5828.htm |