MI HB5822 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-17 - Assigned Pa 312'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-17 - Assigned Pa 312'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; licensing fees; examination and license fees for mechanical contractors; revise. Amends sec. 10 of 1984 PA 192 (MCL 338.980).
Title
Occupations; licensing fees; examination and license fees for mechanical contractors; revise. Amends sec. 10 of 1984 PA 192 (MCL 338.980).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 669 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 535 (Y: 84 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 535 (Y: 84 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-17 | House | Assigned Pa 312'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-10-17 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/1/2012 @ 10:32 Am |
2012-10-17 | House | Approved By The Governor 9/30/2012 @ 2:24 Pm |
2012-10-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 9/28/2012 @ 2:56 Pm |
2012-09-27 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-09-27 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-09-27 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 669 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-09-19 | House | Transmitted |
2012-09-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 535 Yeas 84 Nays 21 |
2012-09-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-09-19 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-09-19 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2012-09-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-09-11 | House | Printed Bill Filed 08/16/2012 |
2012-08-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-08-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-08-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Al Pscholka |
Subjects
Occupations, licensing fees
Occupations, mechanical contractors
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations, mechanical contractors
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs