MI HB5733 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; authorities; exemption for new regional transportation authority; amend. Amends sec. 4 of 1982 PA 432 (MCL 474.104). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5731'09
Title
Transportation; authorities; exemption for new regional transportation authority; amend. Amends sec. 4 of 1982 PA 432 (MCL 474.104). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5731'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-12-30 | Printed Bill Filed 12/21/2009 | |
2009-12-18 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2009-12-18 | Read A First Time | |
2009-12-18 | Introduced By Representative Marie Donigan |