MI HB5682 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Family law; other; definition of eligible domestic relations order; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1991 PA 46 (MCL 38.1702).
Title
Family law; other; definition of eligible domestic relations order; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1991 PA 46 (MCL 38.1702).
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Cavanagh [D] | Rep. Bob Constan [D] | Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] |
Sen. Jeff Irwin [D] | Rep. Ellen Lipton [D] | Rep. Mark Meadows [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 610 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 610 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-11-28 | House | Transmitted |
2012-11-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 610 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-05-30 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/30/2012 |
2012-05-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-05-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Kurt Heise |