MI HB5588 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Assigned Pa 120'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Assigned Pa 120'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Animals: dogs; provision related to tattooing of certain dogs under the dog law of 1919; repeal. Amends sec. 14a of 1919 PA 339 (MCL 287.274a).
Title
Animals: dogs; provision related to tattooing of certain dogs under the dog law of 1919; repeal. Amends sec. 14a of 1919 PA 339 (MCL 287.274a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 331 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 87 (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 87 (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Assigned Pa 120'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-06-29 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/29/2022 02:20 Pm |
2022-06-29 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/29/2022 01:00 Pm |
2022-06-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/23/2022 12:24 Pm |
2022-06-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-06-21 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 331 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2022-03-02 | House | Transmitted |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 87 Yeas 103 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-12-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/01/2021 |
2021-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-12-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Tc Clements |