MI HB5546 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-18)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Reassigned To Committee On Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Reassigned To Committee On Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax: credits; distributor credit for returnable containers; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.847) by adding secs. 279 & 679.
Title
Corporate income tax: credits; distributor credit for returnable containers; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.847) by adding secs. 279 & 679.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 (Y: 103 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-18 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Appropriations |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection |
2024-06-12 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 Yeas 103 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-05-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-05-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-03-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/05/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2024-03-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Will Snyder |