MI HB5479 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons: other; use of public resources for firearm purchase programs; prohibit. Amends sec. 2 of 1990 PA 319 (MCL 123.1102).
Title
Weapons: other; use of public resources for firearm purchase programs; prohibit. Amends sec. 2 of 1990 PA 319 (MCL 123.1102).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 133 (Y: 58 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-03-04 | House | Transmitted |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 133 Yeas 58 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-02-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/12/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Annette Glenn |