MI HB5415 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Assigned Pa 100'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Assigned Pa 100'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; medical services; Medicaid reimbursement of remote patient monitoring via telemedicine; require. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 105g.
Title
Human services; medical services; Medicaid reimbursement of remote patient monitoring via telemedicine; require. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 105g.
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Liberati [D] | Rep. Alex Garza [D] | Rep. Phil Green [R] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Rep. Henry Vaupel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 176 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 197 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 197 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | Assigned Pa 100'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-06-24 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/24/2020 11:25 Am |
2020-06-24 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/24/2020 10:29 Am |
2020-06-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/17/2020 01:38 Pm |
2020-06-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-05-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-06-11 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 176 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2020-05-13 | House | Transmitted |
2020-05-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 197 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-05-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-05-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-13 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-05-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/29/2020 |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-01-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Frank Liberati |