MI HB5352 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-08 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-08 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; rate; general amendments; provide for. Amends secs. 30, 51 & 272 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30 et seq.).
Title
Income tax; rate; general amendments; provide for. Amends secs. 30, 51 & 272 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30 et seq.).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-08 | Referred To Committee On Finance | |
2009-10-06 | Transmitted | |
2009-10-06 | Passed Roll Call # 488 Yeas 58 Nays 51 | |
2009-10-06 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-10-06 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-10-06 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-10-06 | Substitute H-11 Adopted | |
2009-10-06 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-10-06 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-10-06 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-09-15 | Printed Bill Filed 09/11/2009 | |
2009-09-10 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | |
2009-09-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-09-10 | Introduced By Representative George Cushingberry |