MI HB5334 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: fund-raising registration plates; fund-raising plates for prostate cancer awareness; create. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 811hh.
Title
Vehicles: fund-raising registration plates; fund-raising plates for prostate cancer awareness; create. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 811hh.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Hauck [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 (Y: 98 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 (Y: 98 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmitted |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 Yeas 98 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-02-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-09-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/23/2021 |
2021-09-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2021-09-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-09-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Roger Hauck |