MI HB5257 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 95'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 95'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; computer; penalties for possession and use of ransomware without authorization; provide for. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 409b.
Title
Crimes; computer; penalties for possession and use of ransomware without authorization; provide for. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 409b.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 192 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 26 (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 26 (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned Pa 95'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-04-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/2/2018 @ 4:10 Pm |
2018-04-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/2/2018 @ 12:03 Pm |
2018-04-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:58 Pm |
2018-03-22 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-03-22 | House | Roll Call # 192 Yeas 106 Nays 3 |
2018-03-22 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-03-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-03-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 171 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-01-25 | House | Transmitted |
2018-01-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 26 Yeas 103 Nays 3 |
2018-01-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-01-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-11-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/28/2017 |
2017-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology |
2017-11-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |