MI HB5249 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism
Pending: Senate Outdoor Recreation And Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism
Pending: Senate Outdoor Recreation And Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; hunting; use of certain firearms during firearm deer season; allow. Amends sec. 43526 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43526).
Title
Natural resources; hunting; use of certain firearms during firearm deer season; allow. Amends sec. 43526 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43526).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-09-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 562 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2012-09-27 | House | Transmitted |
2012-09-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 562 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-09-27 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-09-27 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-01-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/18/2012 |
2012-01-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-01-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-01-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Lori |