MI HB5179 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled substances: drug paraphernalia; definition of drug paraphernalia; modify. Amends sec. 7451 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7451).
Title
Controlled substances: drug paraphernalia; definition of drug paraphernalia; modify. Amends sec. 7451 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7451).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-10-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/18/2023 |
2023-10-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-10-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Carrie Rheingans |