MI HB5160 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-28 - Referred To Committee On Redistricting
Pending: Senate Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-28 - Referred To Committee On Redistricting
Pending: Senate Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature; apportionment; redistricting of court of appeals; provide for. Amends sec. 302 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.302).
Title
Legislature; apportionment; redistricting of court of appeals; provide for. Amends sec. 302 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.302).
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Lund [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 522 (Y: 62 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Redistricting |
2011-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2011-12-14 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Redistricting |
2011-12-01 | House | Transmitted |
2011-12-01 | House | Passed Roll Call # 522 Yeas 62 Nays 45 |
2011-12-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-12-01 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-12-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-12-01 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2011-12-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-11-29 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/14/2011 |
2011-11-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections |
2011-11-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-11-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Pete Lund |