MI HB5128 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-5)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-5)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax; definitions; definition of enterprise data center; include as qualified data center. Amends sec. 4ee of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54ee).
Title
Sales tax; definitions; definition of enterprise data center; include as qualified data center. Amends sec. 4ee of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54ee).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-5) |
2019-10-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/22/2019 |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
2019-10-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Rebekah Warren |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-5128 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-5128.htm |