MI HB5122 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-17 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-17 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; deductions; income earned or received by certain taxpayers located within a renaissance zone; allow. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 31a.
Title
Income tax; deductions; income earned or received by certain taxpayers located within a renaissance zone; allow. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 31a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 562 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-12-08 | House | Transmitted |
2011-12-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 562 Yeas 105 Nays 3 |
2011-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-12-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-12-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-12-08 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2011-12-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-10-26 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/26/2011 |
2011-10-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2011-10-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-10-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Holly Hughes |