MI HB5122 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-09 - Assigned Pa 86'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-09 - Assigned Pa 86'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; signs; billboard permits; modify. Amends secs. 2, 7, 7a, 11a, 17, 18 & 21 of 1972 PA 106 (MCL 252.302 et seq.).
Title
Highways; signs; billboard permits; modify. Amends secs. 2, 7, 7a, 11a, 17, 18 & 21 of 1972 PA 106 (MCL 252.302 et seq.).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-09 | Assigned Pa 86'09 With Immediate Effect | |
2009-09-09 | Filed With Secretary Of State 9/3/2009 @ 4:30 Pm | |
2009-09-09 | Approved By The Governor 9/3/2009 @ 3:35 Pm | |
2009-09-02 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-09-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2009-09-02 | Roll Call # 405 Yeas 105 Nays 0 | |
2009-09-02 | Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In | |
2009-08-26 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2009-08-26 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Immediate Effect And Full Title | |
2009-08-26 | Inserted Full Title | |
2009-08-26 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 408 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-08-26 | Substitute S-3 Adopted | |
2009-08-19 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-08-19 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-08-19 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-08-19 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-08-19 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-08-19 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-08-19 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-08-19 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-06-25 | Referred To Committee On Transportation | |
2009-06-24 | Transmitted | |
2009-06-24 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 Yeas 109 Nays 0 | |
2009-06-24 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-06-24 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-24 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-06-24 | Substitute H-3 Adopted | |
2009-06-24 | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted | |
2009-06-24 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-06-18 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-06-18 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-06-18 | Printed Bill Filed 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-17 | Referred To Committee On Transportation | |
2009-06-17 | Read A First Time | |
2009-06-17 | Introduced By Representative Andrew Kandrevas |