MI HB5110 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Probate: trusts; procedures relating to the administration of unitrusts and income trusts; provide for. Creates new act.
Title
Probate: trusts; procedures relating to the administration of unitrusts and income trusts; provide for. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 170 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection |
2024-06-13 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 170 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2024-06-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-06-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-06-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-10-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/10/2023 |
2023-10-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2023-10-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Douglas Wozniak |