MI HB5091 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Assigned Pa 118'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Assigned Pa 118'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; reporting; employer reporting deadline; modify to comply with federal deadline. Amends sec. 711 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.711).
Title
Individual income tax; reporting; employer reporting deadline; modify to comply with federal deadline. Amends sec. 711 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.711).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 188 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 81 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 81 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned Pa 118'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-04-26 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/26/2018 @ 11:16 Am |
2018-04-26 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/25/2018 @ 5:36 Pm |
2018-04-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/18/2018 @ 12:52 Pm |
2018-04-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-04-11 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-04-11 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 188 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-02-15 | House | Transmitted |
2018-02-15 | House | Title Amended |
2018-02-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 81 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-10-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/12/2017 |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2017-10-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Bronna Kahle |