MI HB5010 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Assigned Pa 148'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Assigned Pa 148'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; statute of limitations; crime of armed robbery; include. Amends sec. 24, ch. VII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 767.24).
Title
Criminal procedure; statute of limitations; crime of armed robbery; include. Amends sec. 24, ch. VII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 767.24).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 242 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 100 (Y: 92 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 100 (Y: 92 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Assigned Pa 148'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/16/2018 @ 10:08 Am |
2018-05-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/15/2018 @ 1:52 Pm |
2018-05-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/4/2018 @ 4:33 Pm |
2018-05-01 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-05-01 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-05-01 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 242 Yeas 32 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | Transmitted |
2018-02-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 100 Yeas 92 Nays 16 |
2018-02-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-09-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/26/2017 |
2017-09-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-09-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Diana Farrington |