MI HB4740 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State agencies (existing): health and human services; waiting period for enrollment in Medicare and immigrant children's health improvement act; modify. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 107c.
Title
State agencies (existing): health and human services; waiting period for enrollment in Medicare and immigrant children's health improvement act; modify. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 107c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-06-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/13/2023 |
2023-06-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services |
2023-06-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-06-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Alabas Farhat |