MI HB4611 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-18 - Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-18 - Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights; employment discrimination; discrimination for failing to provide equal compensation for comparable work; prohibit under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 102, 103 & 202 of 1976 PA 453 (MCL 37.2102 et seq.).
Title
Civil rights; employment discrimination; discrimination for failing to provide equal compensation for comparable work; prohibit under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 102, 103 & 202 of 1976 PA 453 (MCL 37.2102 et seq.).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day |
2012-07-18 | House | Rule Suspended |
2011-05-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/05/2011 |
2011-05-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2011-05-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-05-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Joan Bauer |
Subjects
Civil rights, employment discrimination
Labor, fair employment practices
Labor, hours and wages
State agencies (existing), civil rights
Women, other
Labor, fair employment practices
Labor, hours and wages
State agencies (existing), civil rights
Women, other
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-HB-4611 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2011-HIB-4611.htm |