MI HB4561 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Food: licensing; licensing fees for certain food establishments; make refundable. Amends sec. 2125, 3119, 4111, 4113, 4115 & 6137of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.2125 et seq.) & adds sec. 4118.
Title
Food: licensing; licensing fees for certain food establishments; make refundable. Amends sec. 2125, 3119, 4111, 4113, 4115 & 6137of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.2125 et seq.) & adds sec. 4118.
Sponsors
Rep. John Roth [R] | Rep. Annette Glenn [R] | Rep. Andrew Fink [R] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Rep. Steven Marino [R] | Rep. Pauline Wendzel [R] | Rep. Ryan Berman [R] | Rep. Luke Meerman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 341 (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 341 (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-06-17 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 341 Yeas 97 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-06-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-03-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/23/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-03-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced By Representative John Roth |