MI HB4561 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Assigned Pa 113'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Assigned Pa 113'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax; exemptions; exemption for certain agricultural equipment; clarify. Amends sec. 4a of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54a).
Title
Sales tax; exemptions; exemption for certain agricultural equipment; clarify. Amends sec. 4a of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54a).
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 195 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 217 (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 182 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 174 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 217 (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 182 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 174 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned Pa 113'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-04-26 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/25/2018 @ 1:32 Pm |
2018-04-26 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/25/2018 @ 1:12 Pm |
2018-04-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/18/2018 @ 2:10 Pm |
2018-04-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-04-12 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Substitute H-6 To Senate Substitute S-2 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call # 195 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | House Substitute H-6 Concurred In |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Returned From House With Substitute H-6 To Senate Substitute S-2 |
2018-04-11 | House | Retransmitted |
2018-04-11 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-04-11 | House | Roll Call # 217 Yeas 87 Nays 22 |
2018-04-11 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In As Substituted H-6 |
2018-04-11 | House | Substitute H-6 Adopted And Amended |
2018-03-22 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 182 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2017-06-06 | House | Transmitted |
2017-06-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 174 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2017-06-06 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2017-06-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-05-31 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-05-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/02/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2017-05-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-05-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Dan Lauwers |