MI HB4535 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Assigned Pa 64'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Assigned Pa 64'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; civil infraction procedures; civil infraction for failure to place a tab on a vehicle within 30 days of date of registration; modify. Amends sec. 255 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.255). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4537'17, HB 4538'17
Title
Traffic control; civil infraction procedures; civil infraction for failure to place a tab on a vehicle within 30 days of date of registration; modify. Amends sec. 255 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.255). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4537'17, HB 4538'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 115 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Assigned Pa 64'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-14 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/14/2018 @ 1:16 Pm |
2018-03-14 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/13/2018 @ 11:56 Am |
2018-03-06 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/5/2018 @ 2:34 Pm |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 115 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-11-07 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-11-07 | House | Amended |
2017-11-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-31 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-10-31 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-04-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-04-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Curt Vanderwall |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): state
Traffic control: civil infraction procedures
Traffic control: traffic regulation
Vehicles: registration
Traffic control: civil infraction procedures
Traffic control: traffic regulation
Vehicles: registration