MI HB4480 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Assigned Pa 104'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Assigned Pa 104'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property; conveyances; certain state owned property in Wayne county; provide for conveyance. Creates land transfer act.
Title
Property; conveyances; certain state owned property in Wayne county; provide for conveyance. Creates land transfer act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Assigned Pa 104'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-06-30 | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/29/2010 @ 3:59 Pm | |
2010-06-30 | Approved By The Governor 6/29/2010 @ 3:37 Pm | |
2010-06-22 | Presented To The Governor 6/18/2010 @ 10:46 Am | |
2010-06-15 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-06-15 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect | |
2010-06-15 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 301 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-06-09 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-04-22 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-04-22 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-04-22 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-04-14 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2010-04-13 | Transmitted | |
2010-04-13 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 137 Yeas 107 Nays 0 | |
2010-04-13 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-04-13 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-04-13 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-04-13 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-03-23 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-03-23 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-03-04 | Printed Bill Filed 03/04/2009 | |
2009-03-03 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2009-03-03 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-03 | Introduced By Representative George Cushingberry |