MI HB4416 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 234'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 234'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property: other; certain restrictive covenants in deeds and other instruments; prohibit. Creates new act.
Title
Property: other; certain restrictive covenants in deeds and other instruments; prohibit. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 302 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 302 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Assigned Pa 234'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-12-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/13/2022 04:12 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/13/2022 02:10 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2022 11:16 Am |
2022-12-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-08 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-08 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 503 Yeas 97 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 12 |
2022-12-08 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-12-07 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Full Title |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 544 Yeas 31 Nays 0 Excused 7 Not Voting 0 |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2022-06-15 | House | Transmitted |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 302 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-06-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-06-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-06-14 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2022-06-14 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-06-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-05-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-05-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-03-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2021-03-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Sarah Anthony |
Subjects
Civil procedure: civil actions
Civil rights: disabilities discrimination
Civil rights: racial discrimination
Civil rights: sex discrimination and harassment
Civil rights: sexual orientation discrimination
Property: other
Property: recording
Civil rights: disabilities discrimination
Civil rights: racial discrimination
Civil rights: sex discrimination and harassment
Civil rights: sexual orientation discrimination
Property: other
Property: recording