MI HB4376 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Assigned Pa 23'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Assigned Pa 23'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: individual licensing and registration; waiver of licensing fees for veterans, members of the armed forces, members of the uniformed forces, and their dependents; provide for. Amends sec. 4 of 1979 PA 152 (MCL 338.2204). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0312'21
Title
Occupations: individual licensing and registration; waiver of licensing fees for veterans, members of the armed forces, members of the uniformed forces, and their dependents; provide for. Amends sec. 4 of 1979 PA 152 (MCL 338.2204). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0312'21
Sponsors
Rep. Andrea Schroeder [R] | Sen. Sarah Anthony [D] | Rep. David Martin [R] | Rep. Robert Bezotte [R] |
Rep. Gary Howell [R] | Rep. Laurie Pohutsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 283 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 236 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 209 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 97 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 236 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 209 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 97 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Assigned Pa 23'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-06-09 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/09/2021 02:32 Pm |
2021-06-09 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/09/2021 01:15 Pm |
2021-06-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/08/2021 09:18 Am |
2021-06-03 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-03 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 283 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-03 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2021-05-27 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-05-27 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 236 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Adopted |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Retransmitted |
2021-05-26 | House | Request Granted |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Requests Return |
2021-05-26 | House | Enrollment Vacated |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Requests Return |
2021-05-25 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-05-25 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-05-25 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 209 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2021-03-25 | House | Transmitted |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 97 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-03-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-03-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/25/2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-02-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Schroeder |
Subjects
Military affairs: other
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Veterans: employment
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Veterans: employment