MI HB4212 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-5)
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Assigned Pa 2'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-5)
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Assigned Pa 2'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; groundwater contamination; Michigan agriculture environmental assurance program (MAEAP); codify. Amends secs. 8702, 8703, 8704, 8705, 8706, 8707, 8708, 8709, 8710, 8713, 8714, 8715 & 8716 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.8702 et seq.) & adds sec. 8713a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0122'11
Title
Environmental protection; groundwater contamination; Michigan agriculture environmental assurance program (MAEAP); codify. Amends secs. 8702, 8703, 8704, 8705, 8706, 8707, 8708, 8709, 8710, 8713, 8714, 8715 & 8716 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.8702 et seq.) & adds sec. 8713a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0122'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 25 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 10 (Y: 91 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 10 (Y: 91 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | House | Assigned Pa 2'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-03-09 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/9/2011 @ 9:43 Am |
2011-03-09 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/8/2011 @ 2:58 Pm |
2011-03-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/3/2011 @ 4:35 Pm |
2011-03-01 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-03-01 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-03-01 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 25 Yeas 28 Nays 8 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2011-02-22 | House | Transmitted |
2011-02-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 10 Yeas 91 Nays 18 |
2011-02-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-02-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2011-02-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-02-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-02-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/10/2011 |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2011-02-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-02-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Daley |
Same As/Similar To
SB0123 (Same As) 2011-02-16 - Referred To Committee On Agriculture
Subjects
Environmental protection, groundwater contamination
Environmental protection, other
State agencies (existing), agriculture
State agencies (existing), natural resources and environment
Environmental protection, other
State agencies (existing), agriculture
State agencies (existing), natural resources and environment