MI SB0123 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-16 - Referred To Committee On Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-16 - Referred To Committee On Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; groundwater contamination; Michigan agriculture environmental assurance program (MAEAP); codify. Amends secs. 8702, 8703, 8704, 8705, 8706, 8707, 8708, 8709, 8710, 8713, 8714, 8715 & 8716 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.8702 et seq.) & adds sec. 8713a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0122'11
Title
Environmental protection; groundwater contamination; Michigan agriculture environmental assurance program (MAEAP); codify. Amends secs. 8702, 8703, 8704, 8705, 8706, 8707, 8708, 8709, 8710, 8713, 8714, 8715 & 8716 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.8702 et seq.) & adds sec. 8713a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0122'11
Sponsors
Sen. Darwin Booher [R] | Sen. Judith Emmons [R] | Sen. John Gleason [D] | Sen. Michael Green [R] |
Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] | Sen. Joseph Hune [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 17 (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2011-02-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-02-16 | House | Received On 02/16/2011 |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 17 Yeas 30 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
HB4212 (Same As) 2011-03-09 - Assigned Pa 2'11 With Immediate Effect
Subjects
Environmental protection, groundwater contamination
Environmental protection, other
State agencies (existing), agriculture
State agencies (existing), natural resources and environment
Environmental protection, other
State agencies (existing), agriculture
State agencies (existing), natural resources and environment