ME LD927 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Commissioner of Professional and Financial Regulation to Conduct an Independent Assessment Regarding a Proposal to License Genetic Counselors
Title
Resolve, Directing the Commissioner of Professional and Financial Regulation to Conduct an Independent Assessment Regarding a Proposal to License Genetic Counselors
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-03-31 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator Bailey of York REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-02 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2023-03-02 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-03-02 | House | Representative PERRY for the Advisory Panel to Better Understand and Make Recommendations Regarding the Implications of Genome-editing Technology for the Citizens of the State pursuant to Resolve 2021, chapter 177, section 8, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |