ME LD927 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Change the Coyote Night Hunting Law
Title
An Act To Change the Coyote Night Hunting Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-26 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-25 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-246) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-290) thereto in concurrence | |
2011-05-25 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-24 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-05-24 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-246) As Amended By House Amendment "A" (H-290) thereto ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-24 | (S) House Amendment "A" (H-290) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-246) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-24 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-246) READ | |
2011-05-24 | (S) Taken from the table by the President ProTem On motion by Senator MARTIN of Kennebec Minority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "a" (H-246) report accepted in concurrence | |
2011-05-19 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Reports READ On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln Tabled Later Today Assigned pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-246) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-290) thereto. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-246) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-290) thereto ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) On motion of Representative SARTY of Denmark, House Amendment "A" (H-290) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-246) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-246) was READ. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Subsequently, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-05-17 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Representative DAVIS of Sangerville moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) On motion by Senator Martin of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |