ME LD912 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Law Governing Administrative Suspensions of Driver's Licenses
Title
An Act To Amend the Law Governing Administrative Suspensions of Driver's Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-05-10 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) On motion of Representative PLUMMER of Windham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) On motion by Senator Mason of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) On motion of Representative CEBRA of Naples, TABLED pending REFERENCE. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=912&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0671&item=1&snum=125 |