ME LD824 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-5)
Status: Failed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-5)
Status: Failed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Ethanol Motor Fuel
Title
An Act Regarding Ethanol Motor Fuel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #82 (Y: 66 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Enactment RC #53 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Enactment RC #53 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-05-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 82V 66 having voted in the affirmative and 79 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2015-05-19 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 53 34 Yeas - 0 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-05-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-74), in concurrence. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-74) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-74). |
2015-04-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin , REFERRED to the Committee on Environment and Natural Resources, in concurrence. |
2015-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |