ME LD783 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Membership of the Sexual Assault Forensic Examiner Advisory Board
Title
An Act Regarding the Membership of the Sexual Assault Forensic Examiner Advisory Board
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] | Sen. Nicole Grohoski [D] | Sen. Lisa Keim [R] | Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] |
Rep. Michele Meyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-04-28 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |