ME LD777 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish a Conditional Presumption of Compensability for Corrections Employees in Cases of Impairment from Hypertension or Heart Disease
Title
An Act To Establish a Conditional Presumption of Compensability for Corrections Employees in Cases of Impairment from Hypertension or Heart Disease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, in concurrence |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-02 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=777&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0557&item=1&snum=128 |