ME LD777 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Working Mothers Who Breast-feed
Title
An Act To Protect Working Mothers Who Breast-feed
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Graham [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Monaghan-Derrig [D] | Rep. Robert Saucier [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #401 (Y: 92 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Enactment RC #234 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #224 (Y: 90 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Enactment RC #234 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #224 (Y: 90 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-06-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 401V 92 having voted in the affirmative and 56 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2013-06-26 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-11 | Senate | (20 -Yeas, 14 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Roll Call Number 234 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York, the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-06 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 224 (Yeas 90 - Nays 52 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-06 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-06 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-04 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-04 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report. |
2013-06-04 | House | Representative PRIEST of Brunswick moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report. |
2013-06-04 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY, in concurrence. |
2013-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-02-28 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |