ME LD7 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand the Membership of the Board of Directors of the Maine International Trade Center
Title
An Act To Expand the Membership of the Board of Directors of the Maine International Trade Center
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Curry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-03-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-34). |
2021-03-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-03-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-34). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-34) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-03-25 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-02-18 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-02-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 11, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |