ME LD514 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Office of the State Auditor to Report on Taxpayer Money Funding Maine Nonprofits
Title
Resolve, Directing the Office of the State Auditor to Report on Taxpayer Money Funding Maine Nonprofits
Sponsors
Rep. John Andrews [R] | Rep. David Boyer [R] | Rep. Richard Bradstreet [R] | Sen. Eric Brakey [R] |
Rep. William Faulkingham [R] | Rep. Randall Greenwood [R] | Rep. David Haggan [R] | Rep. Benjamin Hymes [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #137 (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #64 (Y: 77 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #64 (Y: 77 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 137 Yeas 21 - Nays 10 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-05-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator NANGLE of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 64 (Yeas 77 - Nays 61 - Absent 12 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-05-09 | House | On motion of Representative STOVER of Boothbay, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-03 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-04-06 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2023-02-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-09 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |